This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 00:15:56 (UTC).

MILLS-GRANT vs PACIFIC GREEN ENERGY, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 MILLS-GRANT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PACIFIC GREEN ENERGY, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raquel A. Marquez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2021

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Raquel A. Marquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

Defendant

PACIFIC GREEN ENERGY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUNNINGHAM LAW, APC

Defendant Attorney

Robert David Bolls, III

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

10/13/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

Summons Issued on Complaint of MILLS-GRANT and filed.

10/13/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of MILLS-GRANT and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92595.

10/13/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92595.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

10/13/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

Proof of Service on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

11/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

02/04/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer to Complaint on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

02/05/2021: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

Notice of Document Return.

02/05/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Case Management Statement

02/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration of Service by Mail

02/17/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 3/26/2021

03/26/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 3/26/2021

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Vacates Case Management Conference and Sets Trial Setting Conference

03/26/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Vacates Case Management Conference and Sets Trial Setting Conference

Request for Dismissal

05/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Document Return.

02/05/2021: Notice of Document Return.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/12/2021

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021

HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Vacates Case Management Conference and Sets Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Raquel A. Marquez; Location/Courtroom: Department S303; Disposition: Complete

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Vacates Case Management Conference and Sets Trial Setting Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 3/26/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Service by Mail; Filed By: MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/05/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2009 Receipt No.: 20210205-00534.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT; Filed By: PACIFIC GREEN ENERGY, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT; Filed By: MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2020

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/14/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3756127 Receipt No.: CV201014-0105-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92595.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of MILLS-GRANT and filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Southwest)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2020

DocketFilings: Complaint of MCKAYLA MILLS-GRANT; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 05/20/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less