This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 12:17:24 (UTC).

MILLER VS CITY OF MENIFEE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2012 MILLER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF MENIFEE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0613

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARK MILLER

MARC MILLER

Defendants

CITY OF MENIFEE

JOSEPH FLETCHER

WILLIAM RAWLINGS

KATHY BENNETT

CARMEN CAVE

JOHN DEVER

SUE KRISTJANNSON

DARCY KUENZI

CHRIS THOMAS

JOHN DENVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PROFESSIONAL LAWYERS GROUP

PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP CORP.

11801 Pierce St., Ste. 200

Riverside, CA 92505

Defendant Attorney

BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP

3390 University Ave., 5Th Fl. P.O. Box 1028

Riverside, CA 92502-1028

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2012 OF MARC MILLER FILED

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER, WILLIAM RAWLINGS, KATHY BENNETT, CARMEN CAVE, JOHN DENVER, SUE KRISTJANNSON, DARCY KUENZI, CHRIS THOMAS REPRESENTED BY BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP FILED.

MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMA

MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGE ALLEGATIONS IN COMPLAINT BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER, WILLIAM RAWLINGS, KATHY BENNETT, CARMEN CAVE, JOHN DENVER, SUE KRISTJANNSON, DARCY KUENZI FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER SERVED ON CITY OF MENIFEE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER SERVED ON SUE KRISTJANNSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER SERVED ON DARCY KUENZI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST,SECOND,THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FILED

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DE

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS DEMURRER (12/3); HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR 2/22/13.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANA

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR PROFE

RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP CORP AS TO NOTICE OF OSC HRG; REASON RETURNED: ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC R

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL BY CITY OF MENIFEE FILED.

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER, WILLIAM RAWLINGS, KATHY BENNETT, CARMEN CAVE, JOHN DENVER, SUE KRISTJANNSON, DARCY KUENZI, CHRIS THOMAS REPRESENTED BY BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF MENIFEE

REPLY TO / IN SUPPORT OF DEMUR

REPLY TO / IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$4,050.00 BY CITY OF MENIFEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER BY CITY OF MENIFEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP AS TO COURT ON ITS OWN MTN TO CONT HEARING; REASON RETURNED: ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DFTS DEMURRER TO 1ST 2ND & 3RD CAUSES IN 2ND AMENDED CMPLT BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER, WILLIAM RAWLINGS, KATHY BENNETT, CARMEN CAVE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION FOR DEMURRER; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER BY CITY OF MENIFEE, JOSEPH FLETCHER, WILLIAM RAWLINGS, KATHY BENNETT, CARMEN CAVE, JOHN DENVER, SUE KRISTJANNSON, DARCY KUENZI, CHRIS THOMAS; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2012
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 11/09/12 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARC MILLER FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON MARC MILLER FROM PROFESSIONAL LAWYERS GROUP TO PROFESSIONAL LAW GROUP CORP. ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2012 OF MARC MILLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less