This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 09:45:45 (UTC).

MILLENIUM PROPERTIES INC VS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2016 MILLENIUM PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0232

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLENIUM PRPERTIES INC

Defendants

JEROME CHARLES MARTIN

BRENDA LOLA MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH A WEST

470 E. Herndon Ave, Suite 102

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC SERVED ON JEROME CHARLES MARTIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC SERVED ON BRENDA LOLA MARTIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC AS TO BRENDA LOLA MARTIN, JEROME CHARLES MARTIN FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • FAX FILING BY MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 10/26/16 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC AS TO BRENDA LOLA MARTIN, JEROME CHARLES MARTIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC SERVED ON BRENDA LOLA MARTIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC SERVED ON JEROME CHARLES MARTIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/20/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2016 OF MILLENIUM PRPERTIESINC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/19/16 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.