Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 23:12:07 (UTC).

MIDLAND VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MIDLAND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3372

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

EUGENE WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

System Generated Notice re: OSC: Dismissal of Entire Case.

09/10/2020: System Generated Notice re: OSC: Dismissal of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

09/10/2020: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on EUGENE WILLIAMS with service date of 08/05/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

08/11/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on EUGENE WILLIAMS with service date of 08/05/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92596.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92596.

Declaration of Re: Reduction in Filing Fees filed

07/20/2020: Declaration of Re: Reduction in Filing Fees filed

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on OSC Re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c).; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC: Dismissal of Entire Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCON) Form CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on EUGENE WILLIAMS with service date of 08/05/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check #30893382 Receipt No.: CV200721-0040-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92596.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Re: Reduction in Filing Fees filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant