Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 13:18:45 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PEDROZA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEDROZA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3303

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

NICOLE PEDROZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

350 Camino De La Reina Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

07/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/15/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on NICOLE PEDROZA with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

08/13/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on NICOLE PEDROZA with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

07/20/2020: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on NICOLE PEDROZA with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #30905965 Receipt No.: CV200720-0212-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant