Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 20:15:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VC KHAFAGA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2014 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VC KHAFAGA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0976

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Bl. #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Defendant

SHERIF KHAFAGA

Banning, CA 92220-3612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

10601-G Tierrasanta Bl. #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Defendant Attorney

HIGBEE & ASSOCIATES

1504 Brookhollow Dr, Ste 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (BANNING)

DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED

DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 09/25/2014 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC SERVED ON SHERIF KHAFAGA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/08/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPA

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY SHERIF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY SHERIF KHAFAGA FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTIO

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BANNING) FILED 09/25/2014 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC BY SHERIF KHAFAGA REPRESENTED BY HIGBEE & ASSOCIATES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF MSC AND COURT TRIAL.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (BANNING).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTION); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 10/30/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF MSC AND COURT TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • COURT TRIAL SET ON 5/14/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 02

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 9/23/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant