Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 03:26:00 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT VS VENTURA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VENTURA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3511

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

GIOVANA VENTURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

P.O. Box 109032

Chicago, IL 60610

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Default Judgment (Debt-Buyer) Review. (Non-Appearance)

11/09/2020: Minute Order: Default Judgment (Debt-Buyer) Review. (Non-Appearance)

Declaration of /in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 585 filed

10/23/2020: Declaration of /in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 585 filed

Declaration of /Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed

10/23/2020: Declaration of /Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed.

10/23/2020: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on GIOVANA VENTURA with service date of 08/17/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

08/24/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on GIOVANA VENTURA with service date of 08/17/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Declaration of Venue filed

07/20/2020: Declaration of Venue filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-4962.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-4962.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Writ of Execution Issued; Amount: $40.00; Paid: $40.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/29/2021; Fine Description: Check #170439 Receipt No.: 20210429-00680.1; Paid: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest (MC-012) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Filed By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; For/Against: For - MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Details; Principal: $1,150.91; Costs: $306.00; Subtotal Judgment: $1,456.91; Interest After Judgment: $22.70; Costs After Judgment: $0.00; Writ Fee: $40.00; Credit After Judgment(-): $0.00; Total: $1,519.61; Writ of Execution Issued for County: Riverside on 04/29/2021 - expires on 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Court on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Filed By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Default Judgment (Debt-Buyer) Review. (Non-Appearance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Judgment submitted by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC on 10/23/20.; Filed By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of /in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 585 filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of /Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of /RE Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #835543 Receipt No.: CV200723-0136-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Venue filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557-4962.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant