Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 17:23:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT VS ROCHA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROCHA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3499

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

350 Camino De La Reina,Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

ARNULFO ROCHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

350 Camino De La Reina,Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

11/17/2020: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Return.

11/17/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on ARNULFO ROCHA with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

08/14/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on ARNULFO ROCHA with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

07/20/2020: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-5838.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-5838.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on ARNULFO ROCHA with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #0030901927 Receipt No.: CV200723-0053-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92507-5838.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant