Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 11:44:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT VS MENENDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MENENDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3508

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

350 Camino De La Reina,Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant

VIRGILIO MENENDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

350 Camino De La Reina,Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

04/08/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

04/06/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on VIRGILIO MENENDEZ with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

08/13/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on VIRGILIO MENENDEZ with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

07/23/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

07/20/2020: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92551-7692.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92551-7692.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC served on VIRGILIO MENENDEZ with service date of 08/07/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper, small claims (B&P6322.1C); Amount: $211.00; Paid: $211.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/23/2020; Fine Description: Check #0030903499 Receipt No.: CV200723-0122-CK.1; Paid: $211.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92551-7692.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant