This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 16:15:18 (UTC).

MICHAEL J ASSAD VS DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2011 MICHAEL J ASSAD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5000

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL J ASSAD

San Francisco, CA 94116

Defendants

DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER

DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER A MEDICAL GROUP IN

DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTERA MEDICAL GROUP INC

A MEDICAL GROUP INC

ROBERT J MURPHY MD

JOHN VELYVIS MD

EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

MAKO SURGICAL CORP

DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICSINC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J ASSAD

424 Pacheco Street

San Francisco, CA 94116

SOUHRADA, N.

6802 Camino Berdcio

San Diego, CA 92111-7663

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN HOUSOUERFINLAY BRIGH

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

DAVIS GRASS GOLDSTEIN FINLAY & BRIGHAM

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

MCNAMARA NEYBEATTYSLATTERY BORGES BROTHERS

1211 Newell Avenue Post Office Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST LL

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY

1055 West Seventh Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

YUKEVICH CALFO & CAVANAUGH

355 S Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2011 OF MICHAEL ASSAD AS TO EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER; MAILING DATE OF 02/16/11 FILED.

STIPULATION TO IN SUPPORT OF D

STIPULATION TO IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MOTION FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY DEFT DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER AND ROBERT J MURPHY MD TO FIRST AMENDED BY ATTYS F.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ATTYS FOR DEFTS.

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 1

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MAKO SURGICAL CORP FILED

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MICHAEL ASSAD BY JOHN VELYVIS MD REPRESENTED BY MCNAMARA NEYBEATTYSLATTERY BORGES BROTHERS FILED.

ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE IS

ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRERS AND MTN STRIKE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

OPPOSITION TO DEFT MAKOS DEMUR

OPPOSITION TO DEFT MAKOS DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLT BY ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FILED

STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION TO

STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION TO MTN STRIKE FILED BY MICHAEL J ASSAD

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO I

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER TO THE 2ND AMENDE BY MAKO SURGICAL CORP FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF MAKO

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF MAKO SURGICAL CORP WITH PREJUDICE BY MICHAEL J ASSAD FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL J ASSAD

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFER

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER FILED.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPR

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN VELYVIS MD

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-FILED DOCUMENT(S); DATES FROM 12/29/11 TO 12/29/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-FILED DOCUMENT(S); DATES FROM 08/31/11 TO 08/31/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STATUS OF COORDINATION AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICSINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • FAX FILING BY MICHAEL J ASSAD ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL J ASSAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN VELYVIS MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (NOTICE); Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
237 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MOTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID BY DEFENDANT(S) EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER IN AMOUNT OF $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2011 OF MICHAEL ASSAD AS TO EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER; MAILING DATE OF 02/16/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2011 OF MICHAEL ASSAD AS TO JOHN VELYVIS MD; MAILING DATE OF 02/17/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2011 OF MICHAEL ASSAD SERVED ON DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTERA MEDICAL GROUP INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/16/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2011 OF MICHAEL ASSAD AS TO ROBERT J MURPHY MD; MAILING DATE OF 02/22/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK - TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT ORTHOPEDIC CENTER A MEDICAL GROUP IN is a litigant

Latest cases where A MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant