This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 11:59:45 (UTC).

MG SAGE CANYON VS GARRI

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 MG SAGE CANYON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARRI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0487

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

BILLIE GARRI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR /LOS

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR /LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL BY MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP AS TO BILLIE GARRI WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP AS TO BILLIE GARRI

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/17/17

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR /LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL BY MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT S205.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 FOR JUDGMENT REVIEW. (UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW IS SET ON 7/18/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2017 OF MG SAGE CANYON APARTMENTS LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.