This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/06/2016 at 18:45:30 (UTC).

MEZA VS TEMECULA VALLEY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2015 MEZA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against TEMECULA VALLEY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2566

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

JIMMY REYES MEZA

JESSE ANTHONY MEZA

CARMEN ANGELINA MEZA

JAIME MEZA

Defendants

DR DOUGLAS ALLEN GREEN

DR YOGESH PATEL

DR PHILLIP LEE SIMMONS

DR JOHN CHUNGJOON KIM

DR BRIAN DAVID SIMS

DR JAMES CHRISTOPHER STAPAKIS

DR DAVID E SCAFIDI

DR THANG NGUYEN

DR ANCEL J ROGERS

DR SANJANA CHATURVEDI

DR BITTHAL D MAHESHWARI

DR PATRICIA SAMUELS

DR BAHAA GIRGUS

DR JONATHAN YOUNG LEE

DR JOSEPH G NEVAREZ

DR PRABHAT MUKERJEE

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

DEMLER, ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 E. Pacific Coast Highway Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804-3271

Other Attorneys

DAEHNKE STEVENS LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

1 Pointe Drive, Suite 300

Brea, CA 92821

DUMMIT, BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

101 West Broadway Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

NEIL, DYMOTT, FRANK, MCFALL & TREXLER

43920 Margarita Road Suite B

Temecula, CA 92592

HULBERT & HULBERT

734 Silver Spur Rd #306

Rolling Hills Esates, CA 90274

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF JESSE ANTHONY MEZA NAMED AS DIANA GARCIA IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA SERVED ON TEMECULA VALLEY HOSPITAL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/11/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY TEMEC

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY TEMECULA VALLEY HOSPITAL INC, UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF RANCHO SPRINGS FILED

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE RE A

DECLARATION OF OF SERVICE RE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION OF OF TRIAL COUNSE

DECLARATION OF OF TRIAL COUNSEL FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY J

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JIMMY REYES MEZA, JESSE ANTHONY MEZA, CARMEN ANGELINA MEZA, JAIME MEZA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JIMMY REYES MEZA.

PETITION COMPEL CONTRACTUAL AR

PETITION COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY BY KND DEVELOPMENT 54,LLC FILED

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL FILED BY KND DEVELOPMENT 54,LLC.

DECLARATION OF OF JONATHAN JEA

DECLARATION OF OF JONATHAN JEAN MARIE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY K

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY KND DEVELOPMENT 54,LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITH

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAW MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAKE OFF CALENDAR IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETIT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION TO COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND MOTION BY KND DEVELOPMENT 54,LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS BY INDRANEEL CHAKRABARTY MD FILED.

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA AS TO INDRANEEL CHAKRABARTY MD CHANGE ATTORNEY GONZALEZ & HULBERT,LLP TO ATTORNEY HULBERT & HULBERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS BY INDRANEEL CHAKRABARTY MD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (2) SUBMITTED BY JIMMY REYES MEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA AS TO DR ANCEL J ROGERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • THANG D NGUYEN MD ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DR THANG NGUYEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA BY THANG D NGUYEN MD REPRESENTED BY NEIL, DYMOTT, FRANK, MCFALL & TREXLER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY SUPERIOR COURT ACTION IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY INDRANEEL CHAKRABARTY MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR PETITION TO COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA AS TO DR INDRANEEL CHAKRABARTY; MAILING DATE OF 06/10/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2015 OF JIMMY MEZA AS TO DR STEPHEN AYODELE DADA; MAILING DATE OF 06/09/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF CARMEN ANGELINA MEZA NAMED AS DIANA GARCIA IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF JESSE ANTHONY MEZA NAMED AS DIANA GARCIA IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT SUBMITTED BY JIMMY REYES MEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less