This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 08:54:24 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY vs GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GALLERY BUILDERS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROL A GREENE and Carol A. Greene. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0112

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

CAROL A GREENE

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

METROPOLITANDIRECTPROPERTY AND CASUALTY

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TRIMCO FINISH, INC.

GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.

GALLERY MEADOWS PARTNERS LLC

TRIMCO FINISH, INC

GALLERY BUILDERS, INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.

GALLERY BUILDERS, INC

Intervenor

FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J FERBER INC

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J FERBER INC

5611 Fallbrook Ave

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

, ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

21700 Oxnard Street Suite 1890

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN & KAHANOWITCH

Intervenor Attorney

Tamara Ann Laskin

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Vacating Mandatory Settlement Conference

08/12/2021: Stipulation and Order Vacating Mandatory Settlement Conference

Declaration and Order for (RE) TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

08/05/2021: Declaration and Order for (RE) TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

04/14/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725

12/14/2020: Case Management Statement filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725

Notice of Document Return.

12/01/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Notice OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRIMCO FINISH INC THROUGH SECRETARY OF STATE

11/06/2020: Notice OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRIMCO FINISH INC THROUGH SECRETARY OF STATE

Case Management Statement

10/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

09/02/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Proof of Service on the Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY served on TRIMCO FINISH, INC. with service date of 07/20/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

07/29/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY served on TRIMCO FINISH, INC. with service date of 07/20/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Amendment to Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY Naming Does 01 to be GALLERY MEADOWS PARTNERS LLC filed.

07/17/2020: Amendment to Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY Naming Does 01 to be GALLERY MEADOWS PARTNERS LLC filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

07/09/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Summons Issued on Cross Complaint of GALLERY BUILDERS, INC. and filed.

06/01/2020: Summons Issued on Cross Complaint of GALLERY BUILDERS, INC. and filed.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY as to GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.; mailing date of 02/27/20 filed.

03/06/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY as to GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.; mailing date of 02/27/20 filed.

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Party's Motion - Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Readiness Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/02/2021; Fine Description: No Fee Case Receipt No.: 20210902-00414.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Date; Filed By: GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.; GALLERY MEADOWS PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/27/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *6766 Receipt No.: 20210827-00162.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Order re: Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Trial and All Related Dates; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFilings: Cross Complaint of GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY as to GALLERY BUILDERS, INC.; mailing date of 02/27/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/09/2020; Fine Description: Check #7872 Receipt No.: CV200109-0390-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIMCO FINISH, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AKA METLIFE AUTO AND HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laskin, Tamara Ann