Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 22:50:32 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY VS BARBIAUX

Case Summary

On 10/31/2014 METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BARBIAUX. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1085

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY

Defendants

BERNARD PAUL BARBIAUX

CEDAR CAPITAL LLC

CRST VAN EXPEDITEDINC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LEIGH E CHARNESS

11693 San Vicente Blvd #277

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92320.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: AS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPA

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/3

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF METROPOLITAN DIRECTPROPERTY AND CASUALTY BY BERNARD PAUL BARBIAUX, CEDAR CAPITAL LLC, CRST VAN EXPEDITEDINC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FILED. (OVER $10,000)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FOR PARTY(S) BERNARD PAUL BARBIAUX, CRST VAN EXPEDITEDINC TO FIRM LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FOR PARTY(S) BERNARD PAUL BARBIAUX, CRST VAN EXPEDITEDINC TO FIRM LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B) SET ON 6/26/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/31/2014 OF METROPOLITAN DIRECTPROPERTY AND CASUALTY BY BERNARD PAUL BARBIAUX, CEDAR CAPITAL LLC, CRST VAN EXPEDITEDINC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 11. (COMMISSIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92320.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 5/01/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN DIRECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AKA METLIFE AUTO AND HOME is a litigant