Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 16:19:00 (UTC).

MENDOZA VS JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 02/17/2015 MENDOZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0063

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY MENDOZA

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendants

ANA CARINA JIMENEZ

ELVA GARCIA MCFADDEN

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

170.6 FILED BY CINDY MENDOZA A

170.6 FILED BY CINDY MENDOZA AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ELVA GARCIA MCFADDEN BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ANA CARINA JIMENEZ BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/18/15

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AS TO ANA CARINA JIMENEZ, ELVA GARCIA MCFADDEN, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CINDY MENDOZA.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CINDY MENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AS TO ANA CARINA JIMENEZ, ELVA GARCIA MCFADDEN, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/18/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ANA CARINA JIMENEZ BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2015 OF CINDY MENDOZA AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ELVA GARCIA MCFADDEN BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 03/02/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2015
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY CINDY MENDOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY CINDY MENDOZA AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 4/20/15 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less