Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/13/2018 at 01:50:01 (UTC).

MELESIO VS BRUNO

Case Summary

On 03/25/2003 MELESIO filed an Other lawsuit against BRUNO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0771

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

MARIA GONZALES

ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH

ESTER CONTRERAS

Moreno Valley, CA 92552

CATHIE MIDDLETON

Moreno Valley, CA 92225

YOLANDA KENNY

BEATRICE GESS

Julian, CA 92036

SHELLY MARIE MELESIO

IRENE GARCIA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

RITE AID CORPORATION

WALTER RYAN BRUNO

ESTER CONTRERAS

Moreno Valley, CA 92552

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

RACEWAY FORD INC

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENTOF TRANSPORT

CALIFORNIA TRANSITAUTHORITY

CATHIE MIDDLETON

Moreno Valley, CA 92225

THE FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CITY OF RIVERSIDE

BEATRICE GESS

Julian, CA 92036

Not Classified By Court

RIC391126

RACEWAY FORD INC

RIC391103

RIC391467

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARBARA M RODIRGUEZ

330 Arden Ave #205

Glendale, CA 91203

J. JEFFREY LONG

550 S. Hope Street, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS, LLP

A Professional Corporation 575 Anton, Blvd, Ste 710

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF ISAAC NALIVE

433 West Civic Center Drive

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF RUSSELL J. KINER

215 North D St Suite 203

San Bernardino, CA 92401

LAW OFFICES OF GOLDBERG, KINER& CHIDI

10790 Civic Center Drive Ste. 202

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730-3898

BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1741 Technology Dr #200

San Jose, CA 95110

CALLAHAN MCCUNE & WILLIS

111 Fashion Lane

Tustin, CA 92780-3397

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorney

CALLAHAN MCCUNE & WILLIS

111 Fashion Lane

Tustin, CA 92780-3397

Other Attorneys

DUNBAR & ASSOCIATES

608 Silver Spur Road #245

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RACEWAY FORD INC

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PRODUCTI

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PRODUCTION REQUESTS AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE FOR DISCOVER MTN NO. 4 TO COMPEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST BY CATHIE MIDDLETON, ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH, ESTER CONTRERAS FILED

OPPOSITION TO RACEWAY FORDS MT

OPPOSITION TO RACEWAY FORDS MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER DOCUMENTS BY ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH FILED

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAI

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2003 OF YOLANDA KENNY BY RACEWAY FORD INC REPRESENTED BY CALLAHAN MCCUNE & WILLIS FILED. (OVER $10,000)

MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIEVED AS C

MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL BY ESTER CONTRERAS, BEATRICE GESS, CATHIE MIDDLETON FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL PLA BEATR

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL PLA BEATRICE GESS ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION REQ TO PAY MONETARY SANCTIONS BY WALTER RYAN BRUNO FILED

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR ESTER CONTRERAS, BEATRICE GESS, CATHIE MIDDLETON, ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH, THE CONTRERAS TRUSTBY AND THROUGH ESTER CO BYTHE SHAW FIRM APC FILED (FORM MC-051).

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MTN FOR SANCTS FOR FAIL TO COMPLY W/DO FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTIONS T

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE @SCHEDULED DEPOSITION FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY F

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION/MOTION OF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMP ON PLTFS KENNY/GARCIA/CONTERAS AND MIDDLETON WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/26/05 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YOLANDA KENNY, IRENE GARCIA

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH, THE CONTRERAS TRUSTBY AND THROUGH ESTER CO, ESTER CONTRERAS, CATHIE MIDDLETON, BEATRICE GESS

RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT

RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS BY YOLANDA KENNY, IRENE GARCIA FILED.

FORD MOTOR COS OBJECTIONS TO P

FORD MOTOR COS OBJECTIONS TO PLTS EVIDENCE IN SU PPORT OF REPLY TO OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMM JUDG

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RE: REPLY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RE: REPLY BRIEF OF FORD CO TO PLTS OPPO TO MTN FILED.

ORDER FOR REQUEST AND ORDER FO

ORDER FOR REQUEST AND ORDER FOR ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DALLAS SCOTT HOLMES.

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2010
  • PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED/DIGITALLY ARCHIVED. PAPER DOCUMENTS/FILE DESTROYED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE POLICY/RECORDS MANAGEMENT A.10.400.1, PAPER RECORDS RETENTION AND DESTRUCTION SCHEDULE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY YOLANDA KENNY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; REASON - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, AS TO ISAAC NALIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; REASON - NOT DELIVERABEL AS ADDRESSED, AS TO LAW OFFICES OF RUSSEL J. KINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY ESTATE OF PHILLIP CONTRERAS BYAND THROUGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY YOLANDA KENNY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF MEDIATION; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
249 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2003
  • ALL PREVIOUS REGISTER OF ACTION ENTRIES ARE ON THE CASE PRINT LOCATED IN THE CASE FILE. ONLY ACTION ENTRIES RELATING TO PARTY STATUS WERE RE ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • CASE 391467 CONSOLIDATED WITH 390771 - DEEMED MASTER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2003
  • ALL PREVIOUS REGISTER OF ACTION ENTRIES ARE ON THE CASE PRINT LOCATED IN THE CASE FILE. ONLY ACTION ENTRIES RELATING TO PARTY STATUS WERE RE ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2003
  • CASE 391126 CONSOLIDATED WITH 390771 - DEEMED MASTER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2003
  • ALL PREVIOUS REGISTER OF ACTION ENTRIES ARE ON THE CASE PRINT LOCATED IN THE CASE FILE. ONLY ACTION ENTRIES RELATING TO PARTY STATUS WERE RE ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2003
  • CASE 391103 CONSOLIDATED WITH 390771 - DEEMED MASTER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2003
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/02/03 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2003
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER 10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant