This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 16:52:58 (UTC).

MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP VS VICENTE

Case Summary

On 04/11/2016 MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VICENTE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1246

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP

Defendant

ALFREDO VICENTE

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES APC

1900 South State College Blvd. Suite 275

Anaheim, CA 92806

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP AND FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/16/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP SERVED ON ALFREDO VICENTE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/16/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP AS TO ALFREDO VICENTE, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/28/16

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST ORIGINAL LEASE BY MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST ORIGINAL LEASE BY MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP FILED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW IS SET ON 9/20/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJUD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP SERVED ON ALFREDO VICENTE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/16/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/16/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/10/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2016 OF MEDITERRANEAN FEE OWNER LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.