Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 11:56:43 (UTC).

MCTALLEY VS HOAG

Case Summary

On 04/15/2014 MCTALLEY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOAG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0361

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIJANE MCTALLEY

Defendants

CHRISTINA HOAG

Banning, CA 92220

DELON ROBINSON

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINDHAM, WILLIAM E

1051 E 1St Street

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

170.6 FILED BY MERIJANE MCTALL

170.6 FILED BY MERIJANE MCTALLEY AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY SERVED ON CHRISTINA HOAG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY BY CHRISTINA HOAG REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY CHRISTINA HOAG IS GRANTED; CLERK K STAFF (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER UD ON MERIJANE MCTALLEY C/O EVICTION CENTER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/25/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY AS TO DELON ROBINSON FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 04/19/14.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MERIJANE MCTALLEY - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MERIJANE MCTALLEY AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY WILLIAM E WINDHAM

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JU

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGMENT ON AARON J STATHAM WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/02/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF JUDGMENT ON AARON J STATHAM WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/02/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MERIJANE MCTALLEY AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 5/14/14, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MERIJANE MCTALLEY - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 04/19/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY BY CHRISTINA HOAG REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF MERIJANE MCTALLEY SERVED ON CHRISTINA HOAG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY MERIJANE MCTALLEY AGAINST JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 6/18/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINDHAM, WILLIAM E