Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 06:15:54 (UTC).

MCGOWAN VS HINTON

Case Summary

On 01/08/2014 MCGOWAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HINTON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMELIA MCGOWAN

Perris, CA 92570

Defendants

JAYMEE BEAVER

Perris, CA 92570

MATTHEW HINTON

Perris, CA 92570

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY AMELIA MCGOWAN IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE DENNIS A MC CONAGHY (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

AMENDED ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DET

AMENDED ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2014 OF AMELIA MCGOWAN BY MATTHEW HINTON, JAYMEE BEAVER FILED

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2014 OF AMELIA MCGOWAN BY MATTHEW HINTON, JAYMEE BEAVER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MATTHEW HINTON IS GRANTED; CLERK V MANIPON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JAYMEE BEAVER IS GRANTED; CLERK VMANIPON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2014 OF AMELIA MCGOWAN SERVED ON MATTHEW HINTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/09/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/08/2014 OF AMELIA MCGOWAN SERVED ON JAYMEE BEAVER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/09/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AMELIA MCGOWAN - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 01/21/41 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/31/14.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED BY AMELIA MCGOWAN: HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS (FW-008).

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR AMELIA MCGOWAN AS TO CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/MO; REASON RETURNED: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED BY AMELIA MCGOWAN: HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS (FW-008).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/31/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • HEARING RE: ELIGIBILITY OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO AMELIA MCGOWAN.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO AMELIA MCGOWEN; REASON RETURNED: INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 01/21/41 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • HEARING RE: ELIGIBILITY OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO AMELIA MCGOWAN.; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 1/31/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2014
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR AMELIA MCGOWAN TO BE RETURNED BY 01/10/14. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 1/10/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY AMELIA MCGOWAN (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/14/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less