This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/23/2018 at 04:37:31 (UTC).

MCELWEE VS KELLY DOMER

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MCELWEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KELLY DOMER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3671

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARTHUR H MCELWEE

PATRICIA MCELWEE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC

JAMES KELLY

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

PARAGON INDUSTRIESINC

Cross Defendants

UPHOLSTERY FACTORYINC

THOMAS BELCHER

Palm Desert, CA 92260

PARAGON INDUSTRIESINC

MOES 1 THROUGH 500INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEMER & HARNIK LLP

Roemer & Harnik Llp 45025 Manitou Drive

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

445 S. Figueroa St Ste 3000

Los Angeles, CA 11619

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

21680 Gateway Center Dr Suite 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

21680 Gateway Center Dr Suite 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

GURALNICK GILLILAND & KNIGHTEN

40004 Cook Street, Suite 3

Palm Desert, CA 92211

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRIAL BY KELLY DOMER

NOTICE OF TRIAL BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC, JAMES KELLY, DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE & ORDER

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE & ORDER TO MEDIATE BY ARTHUR H MCELWEE, PATRICIA MCELWEE FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/13/2018 OF KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC BY UPHOLSTERY FACTORYINC REPRESENTED BY GURALNICK GILLILAND& KNIGHTEN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEM

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - UNTIMELY PER CRC 3.75 FILED BY ARTHUR H MCELWEE, PATRICIA MCELWEE

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/13/2018 OF KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC SERVED ON THOMAS BELCHER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/13/2018 OF KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC BY THOMAS BELCHER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 02/13/2018 OF KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC BY PARAGON INDUSTRIESINC REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PARAGON IND

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PARAGON INDUSTRIESINC REPRESENTED BY DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

FILED: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANT

FILED: SUPPLEMENT TO DEFENDANTS CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS ET AL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MINUTE ORDER 1/8/18.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARTHU

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARTHUR MCELWEE FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE AS TO KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/10/17

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES ON DEFENDANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC, JAMES KELLY REPRESENTED BY ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN& BENTLEY FILED. (OVER $25,000)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRERS BY DEFENDANTS TO 2-5 CAUSES OF ACTION BY DEFENDANTS.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 3/01/19 AT 13:30 IN 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • FAX FILING BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC, JAMES KELLY, DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE DEN, HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN VINEYARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • TSC CALENDARED ON 10/24/18 IN DEPT. PS2. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/24/18 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE AS TO JAMES KELLY ATTORNEY ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN& BENTLEY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC, JAMES KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES ON DEFENDANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE AS TO KELLY DOMER PARTNERS INC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE AS TO JAMES KELLY WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 08/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/11/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92253.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/11/2017 OF ARTHUR MCELWEE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less