This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 11:21:32 (UTC).

MCARVIE CRAWFORD VS RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER

Case Summary

On 12/14/2009 MCARVIE CRAWFORD filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1858

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCARVIE CRAWFORD

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Respondents

ESTATE OF JERREL DEAN SMITH

GLOBAL DICOVERIES LTD

ESTATE OF SAMUEL CRAWFORD

GLOBAL DISCOVERIESLTD

ESTATE OF BILL CRAWFORD

JOHNNY B CRAWFORD

MAY K CRAWFORD

ABDULLAH SALAAM

ESTATE OF OB CRAWFORD

REVA JOY DAWSON

RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER-TAXCOLLECTOR

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

BETTY PELLUM CRAWFORD

ESTATE OF CHARLEY LAWRENCE CRAWFORD

EXCESS PROCEEDS SERVICES LLC

ESTATE OF ROY CRAWFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

3960 Orange St 5Th Floor

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED

PETITION FILED

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD IS GRANTED; CLERK GHERNANDEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF

ORDER FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/MANDAMUS; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON PETITION FILED 12/14/2009 OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER-TAXCOLLECTOR; MAILING DATE OF 12/22/09 FILED.

DEMURRER TO PETITION FILED 12/

DEMURRER TO PETITION FILED 12/14/2009 OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY COUNTY COUNSEL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO PETITIONERS COMPLAINT FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PETITIONERS WRIT OF MANDATE BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

1ST AMENDED PETITION OF MCARVI

1ST AMENDED PETITION OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED PETITION

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED PETITION OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY COUNTY COUNSEL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; NTC OF SETTLEMENT ON DALE A GARDNER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/30/10 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON 1ST AMENDED PETITION OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; NTC OF SETTLEMENT ON DALE A GARDNER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/30/10 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: DISMISSAL/NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT/PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION RE JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Entire Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON 1ST AMENDED PETITION OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2010
  • COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER-TAXCOLLECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO PETITION FILED 12/14/2009 OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD BY COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY COUNTY COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON PETITION FILED 12/14/2009 OF MCARVIE CRAWFORD AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY TREASURER-TAXCOLLECTOR; MAILING DATE OF 12/22/09 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/MANDAMUS; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • FEE WAIVER FOR MCARVIE CRAWFORD WAS GRANTED FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; $370.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD IS GRANTED; CLERK GHERNANDEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MCARVIE CRAWFORD (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less