Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/09/2016 at 20:34:46 (UTC).

MAYRA AGUILAR ET AL VS UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD

Case Summary

On 02/22/2010 MAYRA AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1466

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICIA ARIAS

VICENTA ZENDEJAS ARIAS

MARIA ARREDONDO

BERTHA PEREZ AVILA

ELISEO AVILA

ERICA BARAJAS

ADRIANNA BARRIGA

ANA LETICIA BARRIGA

GABRIEL BARRIGA

ANGELICA BARROSO

ELISEO BARROSO

MARIA BAUTISTA

MARICELLA BAUTISTA

JOSE ALBERTO ALEMAN BONILLA

CESAR CABRERA

HILDA CABRERA

JUAN CABRERA

JUAN MARIO CAMPOS

LORENA CAMPO

MARIBEL CAMPOS

308 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENNETT, CHESTER E.

2522 Chambers Road Ste 100

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY RAMON CASTILLO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY SAMUEL GONZALEZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY NOELI GARCIA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY ANA MARIA GARCIA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY ALEXIS JUAREZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (DENIED) BY CHRISTINA FIGUEROA JR FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MIRIAM CAZARES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY JORGE MALDONADO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY LEOPOLDO CHAVEZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MATEO MARTINEZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY VIVIANA MARTINEZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MIA TORRES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY EMILIANO SOTELO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY YESENIA SANCHEZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY JOSE LUIS PEREZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPO

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY ANGEL MELGOZA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • CMC HEARING SET FOR 08/23/10 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT BY OLIN CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY BERTHA AVILA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY ARLEY ALVAREZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MARCOS ALVARADO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY KATHERINE ALVARADO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY JESSICA ALVARADO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY JORGE MEDINA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY NANCY CABRERA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY IVAN CABRERA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY ITZEL BARAJAS FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY JUANA AVILA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY DARSY AVILA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY CHERLYN AVILA FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MARIA GUADALUPE PEREZ FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less