Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:02:21 (UTC).

MAUERHAN VS LEIMAN

Case Summary

On 02/10/2014 MAUERHAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEIMAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0147

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY A MAUERHAN

Banning, CA 92220

Defendant

TERRY K LEIMAN

Banning, CA 92220

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN SERVED ON TERRY K LEIMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/10/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMEN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) POSTED AND MAILED ON 02/10/14

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN BY TERRY K LEIMAN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY TERRY K LEIMAN IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON TERRY A MAUERMAN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 02/14/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY TERRY A MAUERHAN - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/05/14 B1 JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ).

JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL BY

JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL BY TERRY A MAUERHAN

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CORRECTED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED ON 02/14/14 BY TERRY K LEIMAN WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 04/15/14.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED ON 02/14/14 BY TERRY K LEIMAN WAS CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC ON 04/15/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF CORRECTED ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 4/15/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL BY TERRY A MAUERHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 03/05/14 B1 JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 3/05/14, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN BY TERRY K LEIMAN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN ON UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) POSTED AND MAILED ON 02/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/10/2014 OF TERRY MAUERHAN SERVED ON TERRY K LEIMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/10/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 4/16/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less