This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 10:13:25 (UTC).

MATTER OF ROBERT EMEKA ANIGBOGU

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 MATTER OF ROBERT EMEKA ANIGBOGU was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0514

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPHNDUKAANIGBOGU

Decedent

ROBERT EMEKA ANIGBOGU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL K CERNYAR

400 Oceangate 8Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

MISCELLANEOUS PROBATE PETITION

MISCELLANEOUS PROBATE PETITION FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSITION - BEFORE TRIAL (JBSIS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • EX-PARTE HEARING RE: APP REQUESTING ORDER TO STOP FUNERAL FILED BY CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPHNDUKAANIGBOGU REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL K CERNYAR; Disposition: Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • EX-PARTE HEARING RE: APP REQUESTING ORDER TO STOP FUNERAL FILED BY CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPHNDUKAANIGBOGU REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL K CERNYAR; Disposition: COntinued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • MOTION FEE POSTED BY CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPHNDUKAANIGBOGU FOR: EX PARTE PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPH NDUKA ANIGBOGU FOR HEARING 07/10/15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID FOR PROBATE AS TO CHIEF ICHIE JOSEPHNDUKAANIGBOGU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET 7/10/15 @ 13:30 IN DEPT T1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MISCELLANEOUS PROBATE PETITION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CERNYAR MICHAEL KEVIN