This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 11:22:41 (UTC).

MARTZEN V MESSINA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2014 MARTZEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MESSINA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1597

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOANNE MARTZEN

Defendants

RICHARD MESSINA

SUSANA MESSINA

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUZANE, JOHN E

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 07/19/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RICHARD MESSINA; AND MAILED ON 07/19/14 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN AS TO RICHARD MESSINA, SUSANA MESSINA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; NOT SATISFIED FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN REMOVE ATTORNEY H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) JOANNE MARTZEN AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST LEASE AND ORDER BY JOANNE MARTZEN FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, JOANNE MARTZEN FILED.

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR, JOANNE MARTZEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $96.81 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR LOST LEASE AND ORDER BY JOANNE MARTZEN FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DECL RE LOST LEASE AND ORDER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 10/15/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SUSANA MESSINA; AND MAILED ON 07/19/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/16/2014 OF JOANNE MARTZEN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 07/19/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/15/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.