This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 05:33:30 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7492

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL MARTINEZ

Defendant

SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMPLOYEE JUSTICE LEGAL GROUP LLP

3055 Wilshire Blvd #1120

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

LEGIS LAW

2101 E. 4Th Street #A-120

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANA

MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT AND SET TRIAL SETTING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY D

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ SERVED ON SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/01/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ BY SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC REPRESENTED BY LEGIS LAW FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY D

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF PLTFFS JURY FEE DEPO

NOTICE OF PLTFFS JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 10/01/18 AT 9:00 IN 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT AND SET TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PLTFFS JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY DANIEL MARTINEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ BY SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC REPRESENTED BY LEGIS LAW FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ SERVED ON SIMPLE ORTHOTICS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/01/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2017 OF DANIEL MARTINEZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92503.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/26/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less