This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:51:07 (UTC).

MARTINEZ VS. REYES

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REYES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8251

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MOISES MARTINEZ

Wilmington, CA 90744

PLASIDA NAVARRO-VELASQUEZ

ENRIQUE ANTONIO DIAZ

JUAN RENE REYES

ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD

BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

UNIQUE CARS & TRUCKS INC

CHRISTIE GIBSON

RRM PROPERTIES LTD

KIMBERLY SCOTT

JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT

ROBERTSON TRANSPORTATION LSE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

RIC1508297

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AKIVA NIAMEHR LLP

10900 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 930

Los Angeles, CA 90024

BISH LAW

22505 Market St #104

Newhall, CA 91321

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY H PARKER

350 San Antonio Drive

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

ABELTIN & MIGOYA LLP

250 N Golden Circle Dr,Ste.115

Santa Ana, CA 92705

ABELTIN & MIGOYA

837 N. Ross Street

Santa Ana, CA 92701

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER

200 South Main St #200

Corona, CA 92882

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

VIVIAN I SCHWARTZ

560 E Hospitality Lane #350

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3545

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

2677 North Maint St Ste200

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorney

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 200

Corona, CA 92880

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/14/2015 OF MOISES MARTINEZ FILED WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER FOR DETERMINING SETTLEME

ORDER FOR DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE MADE IN GOOD FAITH IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/28/2015 OF JAMES SCOTT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON CHRISTIE GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON RRM PROPERTIES LTD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/23/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAI

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ BY BENEDICTO GONZALEZ REPRESENTED BY RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-C

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2015 OF BENEDICTO GONZALEZ BY JAMES MICHAEL SCOTT, KIMBERLY SCOTT REPRESENTED BY VIVIAN I SCHWARTZ FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-C

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2015 OF BENEDICTO GONZALEZ BY CHRISTIE GIBSON, ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MOISES MARTINEZ, PLASIDA NAVARRO-VELASQUEZ FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-C

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/02/2015 OF ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD BY JUAN RENE REYES REPRESENTED BY TYSON & MENDES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAI

ANSWER TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ BY JUAN RENE REYES REPRESENTED BY TYSON & MENDES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BENEDICTO GONZALEZ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JUAN RENE REYES

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1508

REGISTER OF ACTIONS ON RIC1508297 THROUGH 05/19/16

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/02/2015 OF ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD AS TO MOISES MARTINEZ WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/13/16

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ENRIQUE ANTONIO DIAZ/BISH LAW IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 11/14/17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD, ROBERTSON'S TRANSPORT LTD/LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 111417 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/28/2015 OF JAMES SCOTT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CONSOLIDATED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/28/2015 OF JAMES SCOTT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER B FUSELIER RE CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE NOVEMBER 14, 2017 OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PLASIDA NAVARRO-VELASQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON ROBERTSON TRANSPORTATION LSE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • --AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES SERVED ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON CHRISTIE GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 07/15/2015 OF ENRIQUE DIAZ SERVED ON CHRISTIE GIBSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/19/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # RIC1508297 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less