This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 13:10:07 (UTC).

MARTINEZ & MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 MARTINEZ MARTINEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Family Law Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3605

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NICHOLAS MARTINEZ

Riverside, CA 92507

Respondent

AUDREY MARTINEZ

Not Classified By Court

BRAYDEN MARTINEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/14/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY NICHOLAS MARTINEZ. (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION BY DECLARATION FILED BY NICHOLAS MARTINEZ; JUDGE CHRISTOPHER B. HARMON. (FL-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT F402 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON 12/05/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DECL OF DISCLOSURE;SCHEDULE OF ASSETS & DEBTS ON NICHOLAS MARTINEZ WITH MAILING DATE OF 09/13/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION ON NICHOLAS MARTINEZ WITH DATE OF MAILING 09/13/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NICHOLAS MARTINEZ. (FL-141)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 11/27/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: MSA JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY NICHOLAS MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 10/31/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 9/07/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 9/07/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 11/07/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD(REN) FILED 09/08/2017 OF NICHOLAS MARTINEZ (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY NICHOLAS MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE, 92507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 08/08/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 06/12/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less