Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/05/2018 at 17:39:06 (UTC).

MARTIN & MORALES

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 MARTIN MORALES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1155

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAPHNE J. MARTIN

Riverside, CA 92506

Respondent

ERIQUE JIMENEZ MORALES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/25/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY DAPHNE J. MARTIN. (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION BY DECLARATION FILED BY DAPHNE J. MARTIN; JUDGE CHAD W FIRETAG. (FL-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT F501 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON 08/23/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 08/17/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • AMENDED PROPERTY DECLARATION COMMUNITY & QUASI-COMMUNITY FILED BY DAPHNE J. MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY DAPHNE J. MARTIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT F501 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON 08/03/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY DAPHNE J. MARTIN.(FL-160)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 07/31/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT F501 (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 03/23/2017 OF DAPHNE MARTIN (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 3/22/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 3/23/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 08/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 12/25/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less