This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/29/2021 at 21:02:36 (UTC).

MARIANO vs CITY OF MORENO VALLEY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 MARIANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MORENO VALLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0753

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIANE MARIANO

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF MORENO VALLEY

MERCHANTS LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

MERCHANTS LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CARLSON & JOHNSON

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CARLSON & JOHNSON

2107 N Broadway Ste 309

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GRAVES & KING LLP

Attorney at GRAVES & KING LLP

3610 Fourteenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3837

GRAVES & KING LLP GRAVES & KING LLP

Attorney at GRAVES & KING LLP GRAVES & KING LLP

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER

4685 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E.H. ANDERSON

1230 Columbia St Ste. 700

San Diego, CA 92101

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E.H. ANDERSON

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E.H. ANDERSON

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER

4685 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

12/31/1969: Case Management Statement

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

08/10/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Certificate of Mailing

03/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/23/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

03/08/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of DIANE MARIANO

02/22/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of DIANE MARIANO

Certificate of Mailing

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

12/14/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

12/08/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Case Management Statement

12/03/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/25/2020: Case Management Statement

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

10/19/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

Answer to Cross-Complaint filed on 08/07/20 by MERCHANTS LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC was corrected Nunc Pro Tunc on 10/16/20.

10/16/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint filed on 08/07/20 by MERCHANTS LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC was corrected Nunc Pro Tunc on 10/16/20.

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Nunc Pro Tunc minute order dated 10/16/20.

10/16/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing of Nunc Pro Tunc minute order dated 10/16/20.

Legacy Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

10/16/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Filed: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/15/2020: Filed: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

10/14/2020: System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of DIANE MARIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement filed by DIANE MARIANO; Filed By: DIANE MARIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of MARIANO as to MERCHANTS LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC; mailing date of 02/25/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of MARIANO as to CITY OF MORENO VALLEY; mailing date of 03/03/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/19/2020; Fine Description: Check #4006476 Receipt No.: CV200219-0643-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92555.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of MARIANO and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of DIANE MARIANO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Landscape Services Inc. is a litigant