Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/12/2018 at 01:52:16 (UTC).

MARIA L BANDA; ET AL VS RICHARD BAGDASARIAN INC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2002 MARIA L BANDA filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against RICHARD BAGDASARIAN INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9768

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2002

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

MARIA LETICIA BANDA

JOSE BANDA

CECILIO BANDA

MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO

MARIA EVA ESTRADA

Defendants and Respondents

RICHARD BAGDASARIAN INC A CALIFORNIA CORPOR

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE

P O Box 35

Coachella, CA 92236

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SWAJIAN & SWAJIAN

74-090 El Paseo Suite 101

Palm Desert, CA 92260

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH E HERMAN

114 S Rossmore Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90004

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

EX PARTE ORDER (&APPL)F/ORD AL

EX PARTE ORDER (&APPL)F/ORD ALLOW FILING MPAS IN OPPO IN EXCESS BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON.

OBJECTIONS TO DEFTS REQUEST FO

OBJECTIONS TO DEFTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY ATTY FOR PLTFFS FILED

DECLARATION OF DAWM M SWAJIAN

DECLARATION OF DAWM M SWAJIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQ F/JUDICIAL NTC FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUING MSC/TRIAL IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON.

DECLARATION OF N BOZICK IN SUP

DECLARATION OF N BOZICK IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY ATTY F/PLF.

STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEF

STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MSJ FILED BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO

DECLARATION OF M RAMIREZ IN OP

DECLARATION OF M RAMIREZ IN OPPO TO MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF J BANDA IN OPPO

DECLARATION OF J BANDA IN OPPO TO MSJ FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER ALLOWING FILING OF MPAS IN EXCESS OF 20 PGS BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO FILED

REPLY TO PLFFS OPPO TO MTN F/S

REPLY TO PLFFS OPPO TO MTN F/SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY RICHARD BAGDASARIANINC A CALIFORNIA CORPOR FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR C

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA ET AL ON 04/16/04 FROM A CERTAIN JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/26/04.

FILED: NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANS

FILED: NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL RESPONDENTS MOTION DENIED E035739.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL REQUEST DENIED.

ORDER RE: JUDGMENT HONORABLE J

ORDER RE: JUDGMENT HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

ORDER FOR /RE FINAL DISTRIBUTI

ORDER FOR /RE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2014
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DSODJ HEARING SET FOR 02/20/14 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR /RE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO RE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: STIPULATION RE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FU SUBMITTED BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: JUDGMENT HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2008
  • HEARING RE: APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO OF THE PARTIES FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY MARIA LETICIA BANDA, MARIA EVA ESTRADA, JOSE BANDA, CECILIO BANDA, MERCEDES RAMIREZ MORENO AGAINST JUDGE CHARLES E STAFFORD GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 7/02/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT 2F - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 7/02/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 12/23/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2F - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 12/23/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 12/23/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less