This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/22/2016 at 08:07:00 (UTC).

MAIN STREET VS CORONADO

Case Summary

On 11/05/2012 MAIN STREET filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CORONADO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0299

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Defendant

CURT R CORONADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street, Ste 160 P.O. Box 13807

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 26

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AND FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP SERVED ON CURT R CORONADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/30/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO CURT R CORONADO.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP FILED.

DECLARATION OF UNAVILABILITY O

DECLARATION OF UNAVILABILITY OF ORIGINAL INSTRUMENT/COMPUTATION O F INTEREST/ CCP 1033 (B) (2) FILED

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED (ENTIRE ACTION)

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED LOS ANGELES COUNTY

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $1259.03 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $261.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $892.35 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $196.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO CURT R CORONADO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP SERVED ON CURT R CORONADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/30/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • QAED ALL DOCS/IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 11/01/13 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 11/05/2012 OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less