This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 23:42:45 (UTC).

MAIN STREET MANAGEMENT VS OTERO

Case Summary

On 10/16/2002 MAIN STREET MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OTERO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8312

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAIN STREET MANAEMENT

Defendants

LEOPOLDO OTERO

ADRIANA OTERO

PROCORO IBARRA

FRANCISCO OTERO

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANDRA, SAM

710 S. Myrtle Ave., #600

Monrovia, CA 91016

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETA

FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVE

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ADRIANA OTERO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVE

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO FRANCISCO OTERO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT BY FRANCISCO OTERO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT BY ADRIANA OTERO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL D

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/16/02 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO LEOPOLDO OTERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ADRIANA OTERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO FRANCISCO OTERO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AS TO LEOPOLDO OTERO, PROCORO IBARRA, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO PROCORO IBARRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/16/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAIN

REQUEST TO SET UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MAIN STREET MANAEMENT

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMEN

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART GLICKMAN.

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT REMOVE ATTORNEY MCKINLEY & CAPELOTO FOR PARTY(S) MAIN STREET MANAEMENT AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY SAM CHANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY MAIN STREET MANAEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2002
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - CORONA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • COPIES MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART GLICKMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2002
  • COURT TRIAL - CORONA; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF ADDITIONAL FEES/COSTS FILED BY FRANCISCO OTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/16/2002 OF MAIN STREET MANAEMENT BY FRANCISCO OTERO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS FILED BY FRANCISCO OTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO FRANCISCO OTERO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES/COSTS AS TO ADRIANA OTERO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER STUART E GLICKMAN.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 12/17/02 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. C2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANDRA, SAM