This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 07:20:55 (UTC).

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP VS HIRT

Case Summary

On 06/23/2011 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HIRT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0816

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Defendant

CHRIS D HIRT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard St Ste 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

06/20/2012: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNUSED filed.

06/07/2012: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNUSED filed.

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

11/28/2011: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/25/11

10/25/2011: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/25/11

Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

10/25/2011: Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP filed.

10/25/2011: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP filed.

Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT filed.

10/25/2011: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT filed.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT; mailing date of 07/08/11 filed.

08/01/2011: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT; mailing date of 07/08/11 filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed.

06/23/2011: Certificate of Counsel filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP and filed.

06/23/2011: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

06/23/2011: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2012
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).; Location/Courtroom: Department B1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Banning).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNUSED filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/29/2011; Fine Description: Check #291708 Receipt No.: CV111129-0495-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/23/2011; Fine Description: Check #291180 Receipt No.: CV111123-0048-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; For/Against: Against - CHRIS D HIRT; Details; Principal: $11,856.59; Costs: $464.50; Accrued Interest: $1,406.54; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $13,727.63; Total: $13,727.63

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Clerk filed 10/25/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Filed By: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP as to CHRIS D HIRT; mailing date of 07/08/11 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/23/2011; Fine Description: Check #258584 Receipt No.: CV110623-0237-CK.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection over $10,000 and less than $25,000 CRC 3.740 fiiled.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Banning) of MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Disposition: Complete 10/25/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Main Street Acquisition Corp. is a litigant