This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 17:36:50 (UTC).

MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS VS INDIO SURGERY CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/23/2011 MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INDIO SURGERY CENTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5145

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS

Defendants

INDIO SURGERY CENTER INCORPORATED

DEN-TAL-EZ INC

HENRY SCHEIN INC

EDWARD C SHARP

EDWARD SHARP DDS

DENTALEZ INC

TREVOR HOLLOWAY

TREVOR K HOLLOWAY DDS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

MCCUNE & WRIGHT

2068 Orange Tree Ln #216

Redlands, CA 92374

Defendant Attorneys

KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYAN

23975 Park Sorrento Ste 370

Calabasas, CA 91302

WALKER & MANN

10832 Laurel Street Ste 204

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730-3865

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center Twenty-Seventh Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831-2700

RAY & GOURDE LLP

111 Pacifica Suite 120

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO DEFS DEMURRER TO

OPPOSITION TO DEFS DEMURRER TO FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION BY ATTYS FOR PLTFF MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUATION OF MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JEFFREY L. GUNTHER.

FILED: TABLE OF CONTENTS REGAR

FILED: TABLE OF CONTENTS REGARDING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MSJ/ADJUDICATION BY TREVOR K HOLLOWAY DDS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MADISON DIAS BY EDWARD SHARP DDS FILED

OPPOSITION TO TREVOR HOLLOWAY

OPPOSITION TO TREVOR HOLLOWAY D.D.SS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY TREVOR K HOLLOWAY DDS FILED

DECLARATION OF NORBERT J KAMIN

DECLARATION OF NORBERT J KAMINSKI DDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT INDIO SURGERY CENTER FILED

DECLARATION OF NORBERT J KAMIN

DECLARATION OF NORBERT J KAMINSKI DDS FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING O

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING ON 3/18/13 FILED

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPO

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (NO 3) TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE BY MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS FILED.

DECLARATION OF BURDICK M RAY E

DECLARATION OF BURDICK M RAY ESQ IN COMPLIANCE WITH TRIAL MEET AND CONFER FILED

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TO EXCLUD

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TO EXCLUDE ALL REFERENCES TO THE FOOD & DRUG ADMININSTRATION INCLUDING EVIDENCE & ARGUMENT THAT FILED.

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M VERC

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M VERCOSKI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPO TO DEFTS MOTION IN LIMINE (NO12) FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DENTAL

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DENTALEZ INC MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7 BY PLAINTIFFS FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DENTALEZ

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DENTALEZ INC EX PARTE APPLICATION ON 7/15/14 FILED

FILED: DISPOSITION TABLE W/JUR

FILED: DISPOSITION TABLE W/JURY INSTRUCTIONS ATTACHED; HONORABLE DAVID M. CHAPMAN

SPECIAL VERDICT FILED.

SPECIAL VERDICT FILED.

NOTICE OF PROOF OF PURCHASE OF

NOTICE OF PROOF OF PURCHASE OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT BY MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS FILED.

391 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-FILED DOCUMENT(S); DATES FROM 11/07/11 TO 11/08/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • TRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • POST UNCLAIMED - JURY DEPOSIT CCP 631.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • TRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OF $1500.00 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MADISON DIAS, AGAINST MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE OSC RE PROOF OF PURCHASE RE STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT ON 11/06/14.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: PROOF OF PURCHASE OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT AS TO MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • HOSC HEARING SET FOR 12/19/14 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOTI OF PROOF OF PURCHASE OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
804 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2011
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE SET 9/06/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT;MPA BY EDWARD SHARP DDS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • EDWARD SHARP DDS ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EDWARD C SHARP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/23/2011 OF MADISON DIAS AS TO EDWARD C SHARP; MAILING DATE OF 07/14/11 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/23/2011 OF MADISON DIAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM BY MADISON DE SOUSA DIAS FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less