This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 11:55:31 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS UNDERWOOD

Case Summary

On 03/19/2009 LVNV FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNDERWOOD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah A Christian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4643

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sarah A Christian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GARTH D UNDERWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OFROBERT J COLELOUGH III

8550 Balboa Blvd., Ste 232

Northridge, CA 91325

THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLELOUGH III

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLELOUGH III

 

Court Documents

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

03/19/2009: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

Case Assigned to Department 260 (Collection) - Blythe

03/19/2009: Case Assigned to Department 260 (Collection) - Blythe

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC and filed.

03/19/2009: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed.

03/19/2009: Certificate of Counsel filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

03/19/2009: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC served on GARTH D UNDERWOOD with service date of 04/21/09 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC

05/01/2009: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC served on GARTH D UNDERWOOD with service date of 04/21/09 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC as to GARTH D UNDERWOOD filed.

01/26/2010: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC as to GARTH D UNDERWOOD filed.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC filed.

01/26/2010: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC filed.

Declaration of Erica L Brachfeld re Calculation of Interest & Waiver of Attorney Fees filed

01/26/2010: Declaration of Erica L Brachfeld re Calculation of Interest & Waiver of Attorney Fees filed

Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC

01/26/2010: Declaration re Costs Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033 filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.

01/26/2010: Declaration in Lieu of Testimony pursuant to CCP 585 filed.

Judgment by Default (Entire Action) filed; Honorable Judge Sarah A Christian.

01/26/2010: Judgment by Default (Entire Action) filed; Honorable Judge Sarah A Christian.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed; change firm BRACHFELD & ASSOCIATES PC for party(s) LVNV FUNDING LLC to firm THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP.

04/23/2010: Notice of Change of Firm Name filed; change firm BRACHFELD & ASSOCIATES PC for party(s) LVNV FUNDING LLC to firm THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP.

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

10/05/2010: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Writ of Execution Returned Unsatisfied RIVERSIDE County

01/09/2012: Writ of Execution Returned Unsatisfied RIVERSIDE County

Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

02/20/2013: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNSATISFIED filed.

08/23/2013: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNSATISFIED filed.

Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC remove Attorney THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP for Party(s) LVNV FUNDING LLC and replace with Attorney THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLELOUGH III

11/04/2014: Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC remove Attorney THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP for Party(s) LVNV FUNDING LLC and replace with Attorney THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLELOUGH III

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of full Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, GARTH D UNDERWOOD filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Final Return to Court - Writ of Execution as to Riverside County; Unsatisfied filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/04/2014; Fine Description: Check #27617 Receipt No.: CV141104-0407-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/04/2014; Fine Description: Check #27225 Receipt No.: CV141104-0403-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Substitution of Attorney Filed; On Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC remove Attorney THE BRACHFELD LAW GROUP for Party(s) LVNV FUNDING LLC and replace with Attorney THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLELOUGH III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Final Return to Court - Writ of EXECUTION as to Riverside County; UNSATISFIED filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Issuing writ for enforcement of order of judgment, writ of execution; abstract of judgment; certificate of satisfaction of judgment; certifying copy of paper, record, or proceeding on file; taking affidavit; etc. (GC 70626A1-8); Amount: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/20/2013; Fine Description: Check #10531 Receipt No.: CV130220-0324-CK.1; Paid: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Credits of $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Writ of Execution Returned Unsatisfied RIVERSIDE County

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC as to GARTH D UNDERWOOD filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC served on GARTH D UNDERWOOD with service date of 04/21/09 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $230.00; Paid: $230.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/19/2009; Fine Description: Check #98913 Receipt No.: CV090319-0158-CK.1; Paid: $230.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Case Assigned to Department 260 (Collection) - Blythe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collection under $10,000 CRC 3.740 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2009
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Blythe) of LVNV FUNDING LLC; Disposition: Complete 01/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant