Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/02/2018 at 19:56:26 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING VS SAUCEDA

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 LVNV FUNDING filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAUCEDA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1576

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARGARITA SAUCEDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

1445 Huntington Dr #300

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSI

NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COPLAINT ON MARGARITA SAUCEDO FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 03/21/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234-3201.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 03/21/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO MARGARITA SAUCEDO; MAILING DATE OF 05/11/17 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC HEARING.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 03/21/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AS TO MARGARITA SAUCEDO; MAILING DATE OF 05/11/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COPLAINT ON MARGARITA SAUCEDO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234-3201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - PALM SPRINGS) FILED 03/21/2017 OF LVNV FUNDING LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - COLLECTION (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING IS SET ON 3/16/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less