This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/22/2016 at 15:55:15 (UTC).

LU VS MARUFFO

Case Summary

On 02/19/2013 LU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARUFFO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0212

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YA H LU

Defendant

RITA A MARUFFO

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/05/13

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY YA H LU.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S); MAILING DATE OF 02/27/13 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/13.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/19/13 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO; MAILING DATE OF 02/19/13 FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER C

SUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU FILED

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/05/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY YA H LU.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S); MAILING DATE OF 02/27/13 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketCOPY(S) MADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 02/19/13 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU AS TO RITA A MARUFFO; MAILING DATE OF 02/19/13 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • DocketCOPY(S) MADE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 02/19/2013 OF YA LU FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 4/24/13 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less