This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/09/2020 at 10:10:21 (UTC).

LU V WINTERS

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 LU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WINTERS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0504

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHENXIN LU

Defendants

NICHOLE RAE WINTERS

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS

Murrieta, CA 92562

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAN, KENNY KEAN

640 N Diamond Bar Blvd

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AS TO NICHOLE RAE WINTERS, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION FILED.

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHENXIN LU - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU BY CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8.16.19.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED BY CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS: HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL (FW-008).

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION WITHOUT A

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION WITHOUT APPEARANCE RULES OF COURT 321(C) BY CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO CHRISTOPHER S. WINTERS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/28/19.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NICHOLE RAE WINTERS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/28/19.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/28/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT & PREJUDGMENT CLAIM ON NICHOLE RAE WINTERS FILED

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT & PREJUDGMENT CLAIM ON ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION FILED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHENXIN LU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY STIPULATION; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER BRADLEY O SNELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AS TO NICHOLE RAE WINTERS, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHENXIN LU - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketFAX FILING BY CHENXIN LU ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S101 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/07/19 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/08/2019 OF CHENXIN LU AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF