This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 06:12:05 (UTC).

LOZANO VS PALM COMMUNITIES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 LOZANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PALM COMMUNITIES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0859

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

AFRA LOZANO

Palm Desert, CA 92260

EMIGDIO A LOZANO

Defendants and Respondents

CONAM ASSET MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

PD HOVLEY

AWI MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

PALM COMMUNITIES

CONAM MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

9655 Granite Ridge Dr #450

San Diego, CA 92123

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL -MOTIONS TO DISMISS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT O

NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL. RECORD DUE ON 10/28/19.

REGISTER OF ACTIONS IMAGED (AP

REGISTER OF ACTIONS IMAGED (APPEALS)

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - APPELLANTS NTC DESIGNATING RECORD.

REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE FILED. RE

REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE FILED. REPORTER C JOHNSON, ESTIMATE FOR APPELLANT $28.40, ESTIMATE FOR RESPONDENT $13.20.

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATIN

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL ON APPEAL OF ORDER FILED 07/19/2019 OF AFRA LOZANO FILED BY PALM COMMUNITIES, PD HOVLEY.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - RESPONDENTS NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL.

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - APPELLANT DESIGNATIONS.

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL IS

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED AS TO AFRA LOZANO FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY DESIGNATE THE RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$799.00 BY AWI MANAGEMENT CORPORATION FILED.

ORDER FOR DEMURRER IS GRA AND

ORDER FOR DEMURRER IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE KIRA L KLATCHKO.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2019 OF AFRA LOZANO BY PALM COMMUNITIES, PD HOVLEY, CONAM MANAGEMENT CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2019 OF AFRA LOZANO SERVED ON PD HOVLEY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/04/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2019 OF AFRA LOZANO SERVED ON AWI MANAGEMENT CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/26/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL -RESPONDENTS BRIEFS DUE 03/27/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL -MOTIONS TO DISMISS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - 2CT/1RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S TRANSCRIPT CONSISTS OF 2 VOLUME(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL CERTIFIED TO FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT, COURT OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSITION - APPEALS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - APPEALS CERTIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL. RECORD DUE ON 10/28/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketTRUST DEPOSIT ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketUPDATE PARTY AFRA LOZANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketCMC HEARING SET FOR 07/31/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: SET IN WRONG DEPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2019 OF AFRA LOZANO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 4/02/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY AFRA LOZANO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY AFRA LOZANO IS GRANTED; CLERK CCHAGOYA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less