This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 23:24:45 (UTC).

LOZANO V THALER

Case Summary

On 09/26/2014 LOZANO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THALER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2294

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYNTHIA LOZANO

Defendant

NORMAN THALER

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Ct

San Bernrdino, CA 92410

JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 09/28/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NORMAN THALER; AND MAILED ON 09/28/14 FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/21/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO AS TO NORMAN THALER, UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CYNTHIA LOZANO.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO REMOVE ATTORNEY H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) CYNTHIA LOZANO AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR RE:

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR RE: LOST LEASE BY CYNTHIA LOZANO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR RE: LOST LEASE BY CYNTHIA LOZANO FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • JUDGMENT & ORDER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 3/10/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO REMOVE ATTORNEY H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) CYNTHIA LOZANO AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY JOHN E BOUZANE & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO NORMAN THALER; AND MAILED ON 09/28/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/26/2014 OF CYNTHIA LOZANO AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 09/28/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 11/25/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less