This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 11:18:14 (UTC).

LOUDEN LLC VS ROJAS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 LOUDEN LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROJAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0429

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUDEN LLC

Defendants

BERNADETTE ROJAS

MICHAEL SANTANA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S) AS TO MICHAEL SANTANA FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LOUDEN LLC - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MICHAEL SANTANA; AND MAILED ON 01/31/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BERNADETTE ROJAS; AND MAILED ON 01/31/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 01/31/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MICHAEL SANTANA IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE MARK E PETERSEN (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BERNADETTE ROJAS IS GRANTED; CLERK PYO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC BY BERNADETTE ROJAS, MICHAEL SANTANA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - MORENO VALLEY; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • FILING OF ANSWER BY MICHAEL SANTANA IS HEREBY VOIDED FOR NON-PAYMENT OF FILING FEES WHICH WERE DUE BY 02/22/16 PURSUANT TO GC 68634(G). (FEE WAIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE RE: VOIDED DOCUMENT(S) AS TO MICHAEL SANTANA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED; MICHAEL SANTANA TO PAY $255.00 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ORDER. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR MICHAEL SANTANA TO BE RETURNED BY 02/10/16. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 3/01/16, AT 13:00,IN DEPT. MV1UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LOUDEN LLC - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MICHAEL SANTANA; AND MAILED ON 01/31/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY BERNADETTE ROJAS IS GRANTED; CLERK PYO (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/29/2016 OF LOUDEN LLC BY BERNADETTE ROJAS, MICHAEL SANTANA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/29/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOUDEN LLC is a litigant