This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/01/2021 at 11:24:06 (UTC).

LOPEZ vs CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad Firetag and Chad W. Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1066

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chad Firetag

Chad W. Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTHA LOPEZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CORONA NORTH MAIN DEVELOPMENT

SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP

COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRAD HUSEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Bordin Semmer LLP

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E. H. ANDERSON

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E. H. ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

07/22/2019: Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

ORDER GRANTING STIP TO CONT T RIAL DATES

09/17/2021: ORDER GRANTING STIP TO CONT T RIAL DATES

STIP TO CONT TRIAL DATE

09/17/2021: STIP TO CONT TRIAL DATE

Statement of Agreement or Non Agreement

06/10/2021: Statement of Agreement or Non Agreement

Notice of Remote Settlement Month Mediation Program on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

04/02/2021: Notice of Remote Settlement Month Mediation Program on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

03/03/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Amended Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

03/03/2021: Amended Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Trial Setting Order

03/03/2021: Trial Setting Order

Amendment to Trial Setting Order

03/03/2021: Amendment to Trial Setting Order

Notice of continued Trial Setting Conference

02/04/2021: Notice of continued Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

02/03/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

01/14/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Substitution of Attorney- Civil on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

01/14/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Substitution of Attorney- Civil on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing V.Alvarado on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

01/14/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing V.Alvarado on Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

Substitution of Attorney

01/06/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Document Return.

12/23/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Association of Counsel by SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP filed.

09/30/2020: Notice of Association of Counsel by SEPULVEDA COMMERCIAL DEVELOPMENT CORP filed.

Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

07/23/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: ORDER GRANTING STIP TO CONT T RIAL DATES; Filed By: COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: STIP TO CONT TRIAL DATE; Filed By: COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/09/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0967 Receipt No.: 20210909-00045.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/09/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0967 Receipt No.: 20210909-00045.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Proposed Order; Filed By: COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates; Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates; Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/22/2019; Fine Description: Master Card Receipt No.: CV190222-0329-MC.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT by COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC filed.; Filed By: COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of LOPEZ by COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC represented by LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL E. H. ANDERSON filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: COLONIAL ELECTRIC, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2019; Fine Description: Master Card Receipt No.: CV190128-0218-MC.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of LOPEZ and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of MARTHA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less