This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/21/2020 at 01:33:15 (UTC).

LONGAKER VS THE WESTIN DESERT WILLOW VILLAS

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 LONGAKER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE WESTIN DESERT WILLOW VILLAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID M. CHAPMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6569

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

DAVID M. CHAPMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUDSON HALL LONGAKER

BARBARA M LONGAKER

Defendants

WESTIN HOTELS MANAGEMENT LLC

WESTIN HOTEL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

WESTIN HOTEL COMPANY

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC

WESTERN HOST INC

WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT LP

WESTIN HOTELS PRC LLC

MARRIOTT RESORTS HOSPITALITY CORPORATION

WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT CO INC

MARVIN HARRIS

JACK A COLLINS

THE WESTIN DESERT WILLOW VILLAS

MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC

MARRIOTT OWNERSHIPRESORTS INC

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL ADMINISTRATIVE

WESTIN HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE INC

ARDITH S HARRIS

VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN & MARZBAN LAW CORPORATION

16000 Ventura Blvd Ste. 701

Encino, CA 91436-4494

Defendant Attorney

MURCHISON & CUMMING

801 South Grand Ave, Ninth Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

MURCHINSON & CUMMING LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER BY WVC RANCHO MIRAGE INC REPRESENTED BY MURCHINSON & CUMMING LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR OR

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLA TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR BY BARBARA M LONGAKER, JUDSON HALL LONGAKER FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR ORDER PERMITTING

MOTION TO/FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLA TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT/DECL OF MICHAEL MARZBAN/MPA BY BARBARA M LONGAKER, JUDSON HALL LONGAKER FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BARBARA M LONGAKER, JUDSON HALL LONGAKER.

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNM

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT REASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES HEARING RE: JURY TRIAL IS RESCHEDULED TO 04/24/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MO

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 7/8/19.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC, STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC, STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER NAMING DOES 11 TO BE VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER NAMING DOES 12 TO BE STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC, STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT OWNERSHIPRESORTS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/05/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/05/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT RESORTS HOSPITALITY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER AND FILED.

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: JOINT STATEMENT RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PARTIES USE OF DEPOSITIONS AND WRITTENDISCOVERY COMPLETED PRIOR TO DOE AMENDMENT IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER BY WVC RANCHO MIRAGE INC REPRESENTED BY MURCHINSON & CUMMING LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY VISTANA CALIFORNIAMANAGEMENT INC, STARWOOD HOTELS & RESORTS WORLDWIDE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 09/18/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT OWNERSHIPRESORTS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT HOTEL SERVICES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/05/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON WESTIN HOTEL MANAGEMENT LP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/05/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER SERVED ON MARRIOTT RESORTS HOSPITALITY CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/26/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/26/2018 OF BARBARA LONGAKER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less