Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/26/2018 at 09:03:11 (UTC).

LOANME VS AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 08/09/2016 LOANME filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGUILAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0377

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

1900 S State College Blvd 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

JUAN AGUILAR

San Jacinto, CA 92582

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR). (HEMET)

AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH MONTEL

AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH MONTELONGO TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY LOANME INC FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC RESET FILED.

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAI

REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY LOANME INC FILED

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE S

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY LOANME INC IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLA

SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC RESET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC AS TO JUAN AGUILAR, MAILING DATE OF 11/02/16 FILED. COSTS OF $50.00.

AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH GARCIA

AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH GARCIA TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY LOANME INC FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • --AND ACCRUED INTEREST OF $79.78 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AS TO JUAN AGUILAR; REASON RETURNED: RETURN TO SENDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH GARCIA TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY LOANME INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC AS TO JUAN AGUILAR, MAILING DATE OF 11/02/16 FILED. COSTS OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC RESET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2016
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL SUBMITTED BY LOANME INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS - PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - HEMET FILED 08/09/2016 OF LOANME INC RESET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 10/24/16, AT 13:30, IN DEPT. H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 09/23/16 AT 01:30 IS RESET FOR 10/24/16; REASON NON SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR SARAH MONTELONGO TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY LOANME INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - HEMET; Disposition: Reset Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET FOR 9/23/16, AT 13:30, IN DEPT. H1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT H1. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED (MORE THAN 12 PER YEAR). (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOANME INC. is a litigant