Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/31/2018 at 07:38:56 (UTC).

LLOYD VS LLOYD

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 LLOYD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LLOYD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0919

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC

2135 FAIRPARK, L.P.

JEFFREY B LLOYD

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendants

LAVENDER LLOYD

WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

AARON LLOYD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID E WHEELER

1653 N Vista St #1

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Defendant Attorney

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont Drive Suite 300

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD BY WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/18/18.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARI

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER BY JEFFREY B LLOYD, HORIZON REAL ESTATEMANAGEMENT,INC, 2135 FAIRPARK, L.P., ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2017 OF JEFFREY LLOYD AND FILED.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFR

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD SERVED ON WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/19/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD SERVED ON LAVENDER LLOYD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/26/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD SERVED ON AARON LLOYD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/26/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD BY WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA.

DECLARATION OF OF JEFFREY S KA

DECLARATION OF OF JEFFREY S KAUFMAN RE: MEET AND CONFER PER CCP 431.(A)(3) FILED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD AS TO AARON LLOYD, LAVENDER LLOYD FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY JEFF

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY JEFFREY B LLOYD, HORIZON REAL ESTATEMANAGEMENT,INC, 2135 FAIRPARK, L.P., ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC FILED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (SOUTHWEST); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/18/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COPY OF ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE MCC1700919 WITH MCC 1500384; MCC1500384 DESIGNATED AS THE MASTER FILE; HONORABLE JUDGE RAQUEL A MARQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONSOLIDATION OF CASE MCC1700919 AND MCC1500384; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD BY WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY WOLFE & WYMAN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FAX FILING BY JEFFREY B LLOYD, HORIZON REAL ESTATEMANAGEMENT,INC, 2135 FAIRPARK, L.P., ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD BY WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA; Disposition: Court's ruling on demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER BY JEFFREY B LLOYD, HORIZON REAL ESTATEMANAGEMENT,INC, 2135 FAIRPARK, L.P., ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • FAX FILING BY JEFFREY B LLOYD, HORIZON REAL ESTATEMANAGEMENT,INC, 2135 FAIRPARK, L.P., ELDER PROPERTIES, LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • FAX FILING BY JEFFREY B LLOYD ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD SERVED ON WFG NATIONAL TITLECOMPANY OF CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/19/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF JEFFREY LLOYD FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/16/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2017 OF JEFFREY LLOYD AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 2/13/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WFG NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant