This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 11:09:40 (UTC).

LISA R OZAR VS NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE OF NY ETAL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2012 LISA R OZAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE OF NY ETAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2945

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Appellants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LISA R OZAR TRUST DATED MAY 24 2010

BERMUDA DESERT TOWN HOUSES HOMEOWNERS

13582 Edgefield St

Cerritos, CA 90703

DONALD FRIEND II

Westwood, KS 66205

LISA R OZAR

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE OF NEW YORK INC

BERMUDA DESERT TOWN HOUSES HOMEOWNERS

13582 Edgefield St

Cerritos, CA 90703

DONALD FRIEND II

Westwood, KS 66205

LISA R OZAR-GOLDFINE

LIZA R OZAR

LISA R OZAR

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

"INS 1102368 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Respondent, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

LA QUINTA LAW GROUP

78-370 Hwy 111 Ste 230

La Quinta, CA 92253

LAW OFFICES OF CHARNEL JAMES

500 Olive Street

Marysville, CA 95901

EWANYSHYN, TIMOTHY L.

78-370 Highway 111, Suite 230

La Quinta, CA 92253

LAW OFFICES OF EUGENE C. GRATZ, APLC

301 Forest Avenue #200 P.O. Box 4197

Laguna Beach, CA 92652-4197

PEDNEAU, MARY JEAN

2280 Wardlow Circle Suite 280

Corona, CA 92880

Defendant, Respondent, Cross Defendant, Appellant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF EUGENE C. GRATZ, APLC

301 Forest Avenue #200 P.O. Box 4197

Laguna Beach, CA 92652-4197

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY B

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE.

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LISA

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LISA OZAR FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR /TO ALLOW FILING OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LISA R OZAR

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L EWANY

DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L EWANYSHYN RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL IS

NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED AS TO LISA R OZAR FOR FAILURE TO SUBMIT CTS FEES TIMELY FILED. (SUPERIOR COURT)

DEFENDANT WITNESS LIST FILED.

DEFENDANT WITNESS LIST FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR APPT OF

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR APPT OF SPECIAL MASTER/DECS X2/ MPA BY BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSE HOA FILED

OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED AMENDED

OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED AMENDED JUDGMENT BY LISA R OZAR TRUST DATED MAY 24 2010 FILED

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL ONAPPEAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 03/26/2015 OF LISA OZAR FILED BY LISA R OZAR. FORM OF THE RECORD: CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT UNDER RULE 8.122

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NTC OF APPEAL PKT - APPL DESIGNATIONS.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL LTTR DEEMED REQ RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED.

FILED: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN

FILED: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO REVISED EX-PARTE APPLICATION

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY L. EWANYSHYN ON BERMUDA DESERT TOWN HOUSES WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 04/19/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MI

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER RE REVIEW OF REMITTITUR.

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • HEARING RE: STATUS HEARING RE REMITTITUR FOLLOWING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER RE REVIEW OF REMITTITUR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR CLEAR TITLE/VOID FORECLOSURE/ATTORNEY FEES AND SANCTIONS/RELEASE SURETY BOND BY LISA R OZAR, DONALD FRIEND II; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR ORDER ENFORCING SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY LISA R OZAR, DONALD FRIEND II; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REVIEW OF REMITTITUR.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REVIEW OF REMITTITUR.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO /AND REQUEST TO STRIKE IMPROPER NEW MATTER BY BERMUDA DESERT TOWN HOUSES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REVIEW OF REMITTITUR SET 6/28/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. PS1R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING AFFIRMED & REMANDED FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS; JUSTICE PRAGER, HUFFMAN, AARON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MPA IN OPPO TO AMENDED MOTION TO AWARD ATTY FEES & SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
486 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2012
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING BY LISA R OZAR-GOLDFINE IS DENIED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER DAVID E. GREGORY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • --ALSO SERVED CONSOLIDATED CLAIM (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED 11/22/2011 OF BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS ON DONALD FRIEND II WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/10/12 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE CONSOLIDATED CLAIM (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED 11/22/2011 OF BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS SERVED ON LISA R OZAR-GOLDFINE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/10/12 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE GEORGE KOSSLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER (RE INS1102368).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS - CONSOLIDATED CLAIM (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED 11/22/2011 OF BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS RESET; REASON: NEED MORE TIME FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MINUTE ORDER DAED 1/31/12 (RE INS 1102368).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS - CONSOLIDATED CLAIM (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED 11/22/2011 OF BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS RESET; REASON: NEED MORE TIME FOR SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR JOHN E MCFARLANE TREASURER TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY BERMUDA DESERT TOWNHOUSES HOMEOWNERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # INS 1102368 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less