This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 03:24:43 (UTC).

LINN VS HUSTEDT

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 LINN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HUSTEDT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7991

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINN

NANCY PAIGE LINN

Palm Desert, CA 92261

Defendants

HUSTEDT

DOUGLAS GLAUSER

HUSTEDT PROPERTIESLLC

VARNER AND BRANDT LLP

ARMANDO ALVAREZ

HEIDI HUSTEDT

ANGELICA SAMANIEGO

ANDREW ROSS

SWAN CENTER LLC

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN AND WILLIAMS-OBREGO

ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

29 Orchard Road

Lake Forest, CA 92630

VEATCH CARLSON

1055 Wilshire Blvd 11Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO (PLAINTIFFS) SPE

OPPOSITION TO (PLAINTIFFS) SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS BY NANCY PAIGE LINN FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) COUNTS 2 & 6 AS TO ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HEIDI HUSTEDT, SWAN CENTER LLC, HUSTEDT PROPERTIESLLC

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUM

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN FILED BY HEIDI HUSTEDT, SWAN CENTER LLC, HUSTEDT PROPERTIESLLC REPRESENTED BY WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP. (OVER $25,000)

OPPOSITION TO PLTF REQUEST TO

OPPOSITION TO PLTF REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARINGS FOR 6/18/20 BY DEFENDANTS FILED

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANC

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE & DEMURRER ON 06/19/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED C

MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN FILED BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ REPRESENTED BY VEATCH CARLSON. (OVER $25,000)

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF M

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

DECLARATION OF IN OPPOSITION T

DECLARATION OF IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ARMAN

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS ARMANDOS BAR & GRILL INC DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPOR BY NANCY PAIGE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN AS TO ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC; MAILING DATE OF 01/24/20 FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY N

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY NANCY PAIGE LINN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DECLARATION OF (PLAINTIFFS)/IN

DECLARATION OF (PLAINTIFFS)/IN RESPONSE TO OSC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NANCY PAIGE LINN

DECLARATION OF ((PLAINTIFFS)IN

DECLARATION OF ((PLAINTIFFS)IN OPPOSITION TO OSC FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NANCY LINN BY ARMANDO'S BAR & GRILL INC, ARMANDO ALVAREZ; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR VACATE ORDER SETTING ASIDE REQ FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON ARMANDOS BAR AND GRILL/ A.ALVAREZ BY NANCY PAIGE LINN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO VACATE - RES103064; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOSCFF HEARING SET FOR 03/29/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/17/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 02/26/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/26/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less