This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 18:59:43 (UTC).

LIN VS SOUTHLAND PETROLEUM INC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2015 LIN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SOUTHLAND PETROLEUM INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0347

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHIEN-YU LIN

SHU-CHI LIN

Defendants

SOUTHLAND PETROLEUM INC

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERSTEIN, STEVEN D.

14351 Redhill Ave. Suite G

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorney

ATTLESEY STORM LLP

2552 Walnut Ave #100

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

MOTION TO/FOR QUASH AND NOTICE

MOTION TO/FOR QUASH AND NOTICE OF MOTION BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIO

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH BY CHIEN-YU LIN, SHU-CHI LIN FILED

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - RIC1

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - RIC1512384 BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/06/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC REPRESENTED BY ATTLESEY STORM LLP FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHIEN-YU LIN, SHU-CHI LIN - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD TRIAL.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UD TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 11/18/15, AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CHIEN-YU LIN, SHU-CHI LIN - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • FAX FILING BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC REPRESENTED BY ATTLESEY STORM LLP FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 10/06/2015 OF CHIEN-YU LIN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/06/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2015
  • HEARING SET 10/21/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPARTMENT B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO/FOR QUASH AND NOTICE OF MOTION BY SOUTHLAND PETROLEUMINC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 12/07/15 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein