This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 16:18:45 (UTC).

LIN VS ALCOCER

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 LIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALCOCER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0968

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LI-CHU LIN

Defendant

JESUS ALCOCER

Lake Elsinore, CA 92532

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN FILED BY JESUS ALCOCER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. ($10,000 OR UNDER) (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JESUS ALCOCER IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/14/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMUR

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY LI-CHU LIN FILED

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN BY JESUS ALCOCER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

NOTICE OF RULING BY LI-CHU LIN

NOTICE OF RULING BY LI-CHU LIN FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JESUS ALCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JESUS ALCOCER WITH A DATE OF 6/16/17 (PERSONAL SERVICE) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/16/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LI-CHU LIN - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/25/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LI-CHU LIN - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 8/25/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/16/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY LI-CHU LIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF JESUS ALCOCER WITH A DATE OF 6/16/17 (PERSONAL SERVICE) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JESUS ALCOCER (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN FILED BY JESUS ALCOCER REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. ($10,000 OR UNDER) (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/15/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/16/2017 OF LI-CHU LIN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less